Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Talbot

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England

Titular Bishop of Akka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1727BornHeythrop
19 Dec 175225.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 176638.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
26 Feb 176638.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Akka
Mar 1766³38.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Akka
26 Dec 177851.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
24 Apr 179567.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Talbot:
Bishop Thomas Joseph Talbot (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Midland District

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • bp/od/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013