Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Hornyold

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England

Titular Bishop of Philomelium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1706BornBlackmore Park, near Worcester
22 Dec 173630.8Ordained PriestPriest of Midland District, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 175145.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 175145.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Philomelium
20 Feb 175246.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philomelium
29 Mar 175650.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
26 Dec 177872.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Hornyold
Bishop John Joseph Hornyold (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Midland District

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 126
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1752, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 337, and Page 454
  • op: CB, 13 Feb 2016
  • opd/c1/ob: CB, 20 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016