Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Berington

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Hierocaesarea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1748²Born
1775²27.0Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
12 May 178638.3SelectedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
2 Jun 178638.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
2 Jun 178638.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
1 Aug 178638.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
24 Feb 179547.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
8 Jun 179850.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Berington (VIAF: 73708084)
Bishop Charles Berington (born 1748, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Midland District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStock Hall, Ingatestone, Essex, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Gregory's, Paris, Diocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopLongbirch, Wolverhampton, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Death PlaceBy the roadside, Wolverhampton, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Buried Place (Original)Sts. Mary and Chad, Church, Brewood, Stafford, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England

  • a priest for 23.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,416
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 32
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1786, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235, and Page 454
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Jan 2018