Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vincent Gerard Cardinal Nichols

Archbishop of Westminster, England

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore e Sant’Alfonso in Via Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1945 BornCrosby
21 Nov 196924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
5 Nov 199146.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
5 Nov 199146.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Othona
24 Jan 199246.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Othona
15 Feb 200054.3AppointedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
3 Apr 200963.4AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
21 May 200963.5InstalledArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
22 Feb 201468.3Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201468.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore e Sant’Alfonso in Via Merulana
2 Oct 201468.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore e Sant’Alfonso in Via Merulana

MicroData Summary for Vincent Gerard Nichols:
Vincent Gerard Cardinal Nichols (born ) Archbishop of Westminster

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Westminster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,611
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • i: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Oct 2014