Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Christopher McGough

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Chunavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1944 Born
14 Mar 197025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
25 Oct 200560.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
25 Oct 200560.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Chunavia
8 Dec 200561.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chunavia
18 Mar 202075.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for David Christopher McGough
Bishop David Christopher McGough (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTunstall, Stoke-on-Trent, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSacred Heart, Church, Tunstall, Stoke-on-Trent, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSaint Chad, Cathedral Basilica, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Birmingham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,016
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast