Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father David Ernest Charles Evans

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Cuncacestre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1953 Born
29 Jul 197824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
18 Mar 202066.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
18 Mar 202066.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cuncacestre
9 Oct 202066.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cuncacestre

MicroData Summary for David Ernest Charles Evans
Father David Ernest Charles Evans (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHenley-on-Thames, Oxfordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSacred Heart, Church, Henley on Thames, Oxfordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad's, Cathedral, Birmingham, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Birmingham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Mar 2020
  • c1: CL, 21 Mar 2020
  • ob: CL, 14 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Aug 2020

Quantcast