Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Leo McCartie

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Northampton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1925Born
17 Jul 194923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
13 Apr 197751.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
13 Apr 197751.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Elmhama
20 May 197751.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elmhama
20 Feb 199064.4AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
29 Mar 200175.5RetiredBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
23 Apr 202094.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Northampton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Leo McCartie
Bishop Patrick Leo McCartie (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Northampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHartlepool, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained PriestSt. Teresa of the Child Jesus, Church, Trent Vale, Stoke-on-Trent, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Death PlaceSt. Joseph's Home, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Buried Place (Original)Roman Catholic, Cemetery, Great Billing, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England

  • a priest for 70.7 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • d: CB, 22 Apr 2020
  • loc: CL, 29 Apr 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 43, Number 2,864

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Aug 2020

Quantcast