Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Francis Cleary

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Cresima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1912Born
29 Jun 193926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
8 Dec 196452.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
8 Dec 196452.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cresima
25 Jan 196552.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cresima
5 Sep 198775.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
25 Feb 199178.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis Cleary
Bishop Joseph Francis Cleary (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaddington Road, Dublin, County Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Death PlaceSts. Mary and John, Church, Wolverhampton, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Buried Place (Original)Bushbury, Cemetery, Wolverhampton, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 66
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018