Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffrey Burke

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Salford, England

Titular Bishop of Vagrauta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1913BornManchester
29 Jun 193723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
26 May 196753.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
26 May 196753.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagrauta
29 Jun 196753.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagrauta
12 Sep 198875.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
13 Oct 199986.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Salford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Geoffrey Burke:
Bishop Geoffrey Burke (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Salford

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 14 Apr 2014