Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Holland

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Salford, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1908BornSouthport
18 Jun 193325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
31 Oct 196052.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
31 Oct 196052.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Etenna
21 Dec 196052.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Etenna
28 Aug 196456.2AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
22 Jun 198375.0RetiredBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
30 Sep 199991.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Salford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Holland:
Bishop Thomas Holland (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Salford

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 124
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Nov 2014