Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Davies

Bishop of Shrewsbury, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1959 BornManchester
11 Feb 198424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
22 Dec 200950.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
22 Feb 201050.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 201051.4SucceededBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Mark Davies:
Bishop Mark Davies (born ) Bishop of Shrewsbury

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shrewsbury.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,575

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 31 Jan 2014