Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Pargeter

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Valentiniana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1933 Born
21 Feb 195925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
20 Nov 198956.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
20 Nov 198956.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Valentiniana
21 Feb 199056.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Valentiniana
31 Jul 200976.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Philip Pargeter
Bishop Philip Pargeter (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWolverhampton, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestOscott, College, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Birmingham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,060
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018