Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert John Byrne, C.O.

Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1956 Born
5 Jan 198528.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
15 Mar 201457.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
15 Mar 201457.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cuncacestre
13 May 201457.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cuncacestre
4 Feb 201962.3AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
25 Mar 201962.5InstalledBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert John Byrne
Bishop Robert John Byrne C.O. (born ) Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrmston, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Oratory, Edgbaston, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2014
  • ob/c1: CB, 15 Mar 2014
  • c2+: CB, 6 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,158
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • op.loc: CL, 5 Apr 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Feb 2019
  • i: CL, 11 Feb 2019
  • mn: CL, 24 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Mar 2019

Quantcast