Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kevin John Patrick McDonald

Archbishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1947 Born
20 Jul 197426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
29 Mar 200153.6AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
2 May 200153.7Ordained BishopBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
6 Nov 200356.2AppointedArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
8 Dec 200356.3InstalledArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
4 Dec 200962.2ResignedArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Kevin John Patrick McDonald (VIAF: 43501408)
Archbishop Kevin John Patrick McDonald (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStoke-on-Trent, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady Immaculate and St. Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Southwark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,971
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • ob.loc: CL, 5 Apr 2018
  • op.loc/c1: CL, 20 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 28 Sep 2018

Quantcast