Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Stephen James Lawrence Wright

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Ramsbiria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1970 Born
9 Sep 200029.9Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
18 Mar 202049.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
18 Mar 202049.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ramsbiria
9 Oct 202050.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ramsbiria

MicroData Summary for Stephen James Lawrence Wright
Father Stephen James Lawrence Wright (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStafford, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Austin, Church, Stafford, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad's, Cathedral, Birmingham, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Birmingham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Mar 2020
  • c1: CL, 30 Mar 2020
  • ob: CL, 14 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Aug 2020

Quantcast