Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father David James Oakley

Bishop-Elect of Northampton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1955 Born
5 Jul 198024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
8 Jan 202064.1AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
19 Mar 202064.3Ordained BishopBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for David James Oakley
Father David James Oakley (born ) Bishop-Elect of Northampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStourbridge, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Dunstan, Church, Kings Heath, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady Immaculate and St. Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Northampton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Jan 2020
  • c1/loc: CL, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 27 Jan 2020

Quantcast