Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter John Haworth Doyle

Bishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1944 Born
8 Jun 196824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
24 May 200561.0AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
28 Jun 200561.1Ordained BishopBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Peter John Haworth Doyle
Bishop Peter John Haworth Doyle (born ) Bishop of Northampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlackburn
Ordained BishopOur Lady Immaculate and St. Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Diocese of Northampton, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Northampton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,905
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018