Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmelo Zammit

Bishop of Gibraltar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1949 BornGudja, Malta
20 Jul 197424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
24 Jun 201666.5AppointedBishop of Gibraltar
8 Sep 201666.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gibraltar
24 Sep 201666.7InstalledBishop of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Zammit
Bishop Carmelo Zammit (born ) Bishop of Gibraltar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gibraltar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2016
  • ob/i/c23: CB, 25 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 29 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,095

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016