Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philip Thomas Cardinal Howard of Norfolk, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1629BornArundel House, London, Great Britain
19 Oct 164617.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1652²22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
16 May 167242.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
27 May 167545.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 167646.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
25 Sep 167950.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
1689²59.2AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
17 Jun 169464.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philip Thomas Howard of Norfolk:
Philip Thomas Cardinal Howard of Norfolk O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a cardinal for 19.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 May 1675
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015