Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. John Henry Cardinal Newman, C.O. †

Deceased

Priest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1801Born
9 Oct 184544.6Converted
30 May 184746.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
12 May 187978.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 187978.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
11 Aug 189089.4DiedPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
19 Sep 2010Beatified
13 Oct 2019Canonized

MicroData Summary for Bl. John Henry Newman (VIAF: 17227308)
Bl. John Henry Cardinal Newman C.O. (born , died ) Priest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceEdgbaston, Birmingham, Diocese of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
Buried Place (Original)Oratory House, Cemetery, Rednal, Diocese of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
Buried Place (Current)Oratory, Chapel, Birmingham, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a cardinal for 11.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 May 1879
  • cano: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 Jul 2019

Quantcast