Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Laurence York, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Nebbi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1687²Born
28 Dec 170518.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Dec 171124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 May 174154.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
13 May 174154.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nebbi
10 Aug 174154.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nebbi
22 May 175063.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
11 Jul 176376.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
14 Apr 177083.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Laurence York
Bishop William Laurence York O.S.B. (born 1687, died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Western District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales)
Ordained PriestSt. Gregory's, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopSt. Gregory's, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Death PlaceSt. Gregory's, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Buried Place (Original)St. Gregory's, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,412
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,162
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,124
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 222
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 304, and Page 454
  • op: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • nm: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast