Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Gradwell

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England

Titular Bishop of Lydda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1777BornClifton-cum-Salwick
1801²23.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
4 Dec 180225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
17 Jun 182851.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
17 Jun 182851.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
24 Jun 182851.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
15 Mar 183356.1DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Gradwell
Bishop Robert Gradwell (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 247
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 103
  • od/c0: CB, 16 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 17 Feb 2016