Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godric Kean

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Titular Bishop of Tavium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1866Born
22 Mar 189629.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 192458.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
14 Jul 192458.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tavium
19 Oct 192458.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tavium
Dec 1928²62.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
5 May 193366.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Godric Kean
Bishop Godric Kean (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurham, Great Britain

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast