Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grégoire Haggiar

Deceased

Bishop of Akka (Melkite Greek), Israel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1875Born
3 Jan 189721.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 190126.0AppointedBishop of Akka (Melkite Greek), Israel
24 Mar 190126.0Ordained BishopBishop of Akka (Melkite Greek), Israel
30 Oct 194065.6DiedBishop of Akka (Melkite Greek), Israel

MicroData Summary for Grégoire Haggiar
Bishop Grégoire Haggiar (born , died ) Bishop of Akka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRaim, Lebanon

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Feb 2018