Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Adrian Hankinson, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1817Born
15 Sep 186345.9AppointedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
27 Dec 186346.2Ordained BishopBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
21 Sep 187052.9DiedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius

MicroData Summary for Michael Adrian Hankinson
Bishop Michael Adrian Hankinson O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Port-Louis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarrington, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain, Great Britain
Ordained BishopMinerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 466
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017