Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Patrick Edward O’Connor

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Tokelau, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1932Born
16 Jul 195725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Wellington, New Zealand
26 Jun 199260.2AppointedSuperior of Tokelau, Pacific (Oceania)
May 2011³79.1RetiredSuperior of Tokelau, Pacific (Oceania)
3 Dec 201482.7DiedSuperior Emeritus of Tokelau, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Edward O’Connor
Father Patrick Edward O’Connor (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Tokelau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMasterton, New Zealand

  • a priest for 57.3 years

Source(s):
  • r: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2011, Number 8
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 1,076
  • d: CB, 11 Dec 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • opd: CB, 12 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018