Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael O’Connor

Deceased

Bishop of Ballarat


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1829BornDublin, Ireland
10 Jun 185424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
24 Apr 187444.6AppointedBishop of Ballarat, Australia
17 May 187444.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ballarat, Australia
20 Dec 187445.2InstalledBishop of Ballarat, Australia
14 Feb 188353.4DiedBishop of Ballarat, Australia

MicroData Summary for Michael O’Connor:
Bishop Michael O’Connor (born , died ) Bishop of Ballarat

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,313
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 139
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013