Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Casey

Deceased

Bishop of Ross, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1873Born
21 Jun 189623.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 193562.4AppointedBishop of Ross, Ireland
15 Sep 193562.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ross, Ireland
15 Sep 194067.6DiedBishop of Ross, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick Casey
Bishop Patrick Casey (born , died ) Bishop of Ross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallynoe

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018