Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John McCarthy

Deceased

Bishop of Cloyne, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1815Born
21 May 184226.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 187459.1AppointedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
28 Oct 187459.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
9 Dec 189378.4DiedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John McCarthy
Bishop John McCarthy (born , died ) Bishop of Cloyne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFermoy
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Pro-Cathderal, Fermoy

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017