Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Joseph Fitzgerald

Deceased

Bishop of Gibraltar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1881Born
15 Aug 190524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cloyne, Ireland
25 May 192745.7AppointedBishop of Gibraltar
9 Oct 192746.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gibraltar
15 Feb 195674.5DiedBishop of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for Richard Joseph Fitzgerald
Bishop Richard Joseph Fitzgerald (born , died ) Bishop of Gibraltar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMidleton, Diocese of Cloyne, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Colman, Pro-Cathedral, Cobh, Diocese of Cloyne, Ireland
Death PlaceGibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar
Buried Place (Original)St Mary the Crowned, Cathedral, Gibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1927, Number 56
  • loc: CL, 10 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 27 May 2020

Quantcast