Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Comerford

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Corycus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1828¹Born
13 May 185628.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Nov 188860.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
2 Nov 188860.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
1 Jan 188961.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
19 Aug 189567.6DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Comerford (VIAF: 9376707)
Bishop Michael Comerford (born 1828, died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDean Staunton
Ordained BishopCathedral, Carlow

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 228, and Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017