Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Ward

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Sita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1905Born
29 Jun 192923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Jul 196054.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Jul 196054.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
28 Sep 196055.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita
21 Oct 197368.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Ward
Bishop James Ward (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Glasgow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDumbarton, Dunbartonshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Death PlaceHoly Cross, Church, Crosshill, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter, Cemetery, Dalberth, Glasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 97
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast