Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roderick Wright

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland

Note/Previous Titular See: (renounced the dignity of bishop)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1940BornGlasgow
29 Jun 196424.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 199050.5AppointedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Jan 199150.5Ordained BishopBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
19 Sep 199656.2ResignedBishop of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain
23 May 200564.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Argyll and The Isles, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Roderick Wright:
Bishop Roderick Wright (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Argyll and The Isles

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,308
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013