Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Nolan

Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1954 Born
30 Jun 197723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
22 Nov 201460.8AppointedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Feb 201561.0Ordained BishopBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
4 Feb 202268.0AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
26 Feb 202268.0InstalledArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Nolan
(WikiData: Q18572319)
Archbishop William Nolan (born ) Archbishop of Glasgow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMotherwell, Lanarkshire, Diocese of Motherwell, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Bernadette’s, Church, Motherwell, Lanarkshire, Diocese of Motherwell, Scotland
Ordained BishopGrand Hall, Kilmarnock, Ayrshire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Glasgow.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 25 Nov 2014
  • c2: CB, 13 Feb 2015
  • c34: CB, 14 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,368
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Feb 2022
  • i: CB, 4 Feb 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 11 Jul 2024