Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice Taylor

Bishop Emeritus of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1926 Born
2 Jul 195024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Motherwell, Scotland, Great Britain
4 Apr 198154.9AppointedBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
9 Jun 198155.0Ordained BishopBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
7 Apr 200477.9RetiredBishop of Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Maurice Taylor (VIAF: 36880623)
Bishop Maurice Taylor (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Galloway

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHamilton, Lanarkshire, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopFatima House, Coodham, Kilmarnock, Ayrshire, Diocese of Galloway, Scotland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Galloway.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 23 Mar 2018