Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alexander John Grant

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Sura

Titular See: (died before consecration)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1693²Born
16 Sep 172734.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
16 Sep 172734.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
19 Sep 172734.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander John Grant
Father Alexander John Grant (born 1693, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Highland District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScottish Highlands

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: CB, 17 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018