Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Alexander Matheson

Deceased

Bishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1901Born
7 Mar 192523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Aug 194746.2AppointedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
24 Sep 194746.4Ordained BishopBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain
5 Jul 195049.1DiedBishop of Aberdeen, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Alexander Matheson
Bishop John Alexander Matheson (born , died ) Bishop of Aberdeen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTomintoul, Ballindalloch, Moray, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Mary of the Assumption, Cathedral, Aberdeen, Aberdeen City, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Death PlaceBishop's House, Aberdeen, Aberdeen City, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Catholic, Cemetery, Tomintoul, Ballindalloch, Moray, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 97
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast