Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Boudot

Deceased

Bishop of Arras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹BornSalins
22 Feb 160325.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 161335.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
22 Apr 161335.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
14 Jan 161941.0AppointedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
12 May 161941.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
18 Aug 162648.6SelectedBishop of Arras, France
8 Feb 162749.1ConfirmedBishop of Arras, France
11 Nov 163557.8DiedBishop of Arras, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Boudot:
Bishop Paul Boudot (died ) Bishop of Arras

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100, and Page 99
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015