Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Quentin Menard

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Sep 1439AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
21 Feb 1440Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
18 Dec 1462DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Quentin Menard
Archbishop Quentin Menard (died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 106
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,745

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast