Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Chevrot

Deceased

Bishop of Toul, France


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1436AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
5 Sep 1460AppointedBishop of Toul, France
22 Sep 1460DiedBishop of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Chevrot
Bishop Jean Chevrot (died ) Bishop of Toul

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 253, and Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018