Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Claude Ézechiel Jean-Baptiste Boulanger

Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1945 Born
25 Jun 197227.3Ordained PriestPriest of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
16 Oct 200156.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France
2 Dec 200156.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France
25 Apr 200257.1SucceededBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
12 Mar 201065.0AppointedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
27 Jun 202075.3RetiredBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Ézechiel Jean-Baptiste Boulanger
Bishop Jean-Claude Ézechiel Jean-Baptiste Boulanger (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJourny
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sées, Diocese of Sées {Séez}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bayeux (-Lisieux).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,081
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 27 Jun 2020

Quantcast