Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Melun

Deceased

Bishop of Thérouanne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jul 1510AppointedBishop of Arras, France
26 Nov 1516AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
22 Nov 1521DiedBishop of Thérouanne, France

MicroData Summary for François de Melun
Bishop François de Melun (died ) Bishop of Thérouanne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 250, and Page 122
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1510, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast