Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adhémar Robert

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jul 1359AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
11 Oct 1368AppointedBishop of Arras, France
6 Jun 1371AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
14 May 1376AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
25 Jan 1385DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Adhémar Robert
Archbishop Adhémar Robert (died ) Archbishop of Sens

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 351, and Page 448
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 116, and Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Feb 2021

Quantcast