Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement VI

Pierre Roger, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1290¹Born
3 Dec 132838.9AppointedBishop of Arras, France
24 Nov 132939.8AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
14 Dec 133040.9AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
18 Dec 133848.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
18 Dec 133848.9Elevated to Cardinal
7 May 134252.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 May 134252.3Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Dec 135262.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Roger (VIAF: 51660071)
Pope Pierre Roger O.S.B. (born 1290, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau, Maumont, Diocese of Tulle, France
Ordained BishopAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon, France
Death PlaceAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Original)Notres-Dams-des Doms, Cathedral, Avignon, Archdiocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Current)La Chaise-Dieu, Abbey, Auvergne

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
  • a cardinal for 3.3 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1338
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 448
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 10,300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018