Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Humbert de Viennois

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jan 1351Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
3 Jan 1351AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
25 May 1355DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

MicroData Summary for Humbert de Viennois
Patriarch Humbert de Viennois (died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 82
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,737

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Jun 2020

Quantcast