Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffrey Grandfeld (Grosfeld), O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Mar 1347AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
8 Apr 1347Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
22 Oct 1348DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Geoffrey Grandfeld (Grosfeld):
Bishop Geoffrey Grandfeld (Grosfeld) O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Ferns

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 247
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,806

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013