Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philippe Cardinal de Luxembourg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1445BornFrance
4 Nov 147631.8AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
21 Jan 149550.1Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 149550.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
3 Feb 149651.1SelectedBishop of Thérouanne, France
12 Nov 149853.9ConfirmedBishop of Thérouanne, France
27 Jan 150762.1ResignedBishop of Le Mans, France
3 Jun 150964.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
8 Sep 150964.7AppointedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
9 Sep 150964.7AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
26 Oct 150964.8InstalledBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
20 Jan 151166.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
9 Jul 151166.5ResignedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
26 Nov 151671.9AppointedBishop of Arras, France
10 Mar 151873.2ResignedBishop of Arras, France
2 Jun 151974.4DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe de Luxembourg:
Cardinal Philippe de Luxembourg (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Mans

  • a cardinal for 24.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Jan 1495
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 162
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013