Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Miguel Alfredo Barat, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect of Tefé, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1864Born
4 Jun 188722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
16 Aug 191045.7AppointedPrefect of Tefé, Brazil
194681.1DiedPrefect of Tefé, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Miguel Alfredo Barat
Father Miguel Alfredo Barat C.S.Sp. (born , died 1946) Prefect of Tefé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrouzille, France

  • a priest for 58.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018