Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles Van Der Heyden (Merica), O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France

Titular Bishop of Berytus


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Feb 1486ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
10 May 1499AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
10 May 1499AppointedTitular Bishop of Berytus
8 Sep 1499Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berytus
5 Feb 1505DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Gilles Van Der Heyden (Merica)
Bishop Gilles Van Der Heyden (Merica) O. Carm. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalines

  • a bishop for 5.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 105
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,499, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast