Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Briselot, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Oristano, Italy

Titular Bishop of Berytus

Auxiliary Bishop of Cambrai


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Apr 1505AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambrai, France
4 Apr 1505AppointedTitular Bishop of Berytus
23 Dec 1517AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
1520²ResignedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
11 Sep 1520DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Briselot (VIAF: 15177011)
Archbishop Jean Briselot O. Carm. (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValenciennes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 133, and Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018